US HB220 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-201. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-201. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the expansion of an existing hydroelectric project, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the licensee for the Terror Lake Hydroelectric Project in Kodiak Island, Alaska, to occupy not more than 20 acres of federal land to construct, operate, and maintain the Upper Hidden Basin Diversion Expansion without further authorization under the Alaska National Interest Lands Conservation Act or from the Department of the Interior.
Title
To authorize the expansion of an existing hydroelectric project, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 330 (Y: 424 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-201. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4809) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 159. |
2017-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 1 (Roll no. 330). (text: CR H5204) |
2017-06-27 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5218-5219) |
2017-06-27 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 220. |
2017-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5204-5205) |
2017-06-27 | House | Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 101. |
2017-06-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-154. |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-04-03 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB214 (Related) 2017-06-13 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 141.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
Subjects
Alaska
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Water use and supply
Alternative and renewable resources
Dams and canals
Electric power generation and transmission
Energy
Lakes and rivers
Licensing and registrations
Water use and supply