US HB2193 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 117-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 393.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Occupational Safety and Health Administration to issue an occupational safety and health standard to protect workers from heat-related injuries and illnesses.
Title
AsunciĆ³n Valdivia Heat Illness and Fatality Prevention Act of 2022
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 393. |
2022-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Education and Labor. H. Rept. 117-547. |
2022-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 27 - 19. |
2022-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor. |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1068 (Related) 2021-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.