US HB2182 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-26 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Plum Island Preservation Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to submit to Congress a report on alternatives for the final disposition of Plum Island, New York, including transfer to another government or nonprofit entity for education, research, or conservation purposes. This report must contain, for each alternative, an analysis of: the effect it would have on the island's resources; remediation responsibilities under it; legislation necessary to implement it; possible implications and issues of implementing it; potential costs, including costs of the transition, hazard mitigation, and cleanup of property that would be incurred by a recipient; and potential revenue. (Sec. 4) No action, including any pre-sale marketing activity, may be taken to carry out the requirement under current law for the General Services Administration to sell the property and assets that support Plum Island operations until at least 180 days after such report has been submitted.
Title
Plum Island Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. John Faso [R-NY] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2017-07-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6239) |
2017-07-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2182. |
2017-07-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6239-6241) |
2017-07-25 | House | Mr. Donovan moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection. |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Land transfers
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Land transfers
New York State
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Veterinary medicine and animal diseases