US HB2170 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title XIX of the Social Security Act to improve access to adult vaccines under Medicaid.
Title
HAPI Act Helping Adults Protect Immunity Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB581 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
HB5376 (Related) 2022-08-16 - Became Public Law No: 117-169.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2170/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2170/BILLS-117hr2170ih.pdf |