US HB2167 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-29.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Became Public Law No: 113-29.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.) Reverse Mortgage Stabilization Act of 2013 - Amends the National Housing Act, with respect to mortgage insurance for home equity conversion mortgages (reverse mortgages) of elderly homeowners, to authorize the Secretary of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) to establish, by notice or mortgagee letter, any additional or alternative requirements determined necessary to improve the fiscal safety and soundness of the reverse mortgage program. Declares that such requirements shall take effect upon issuance.
Title
Reverse Mortgage Stabilization Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-29. |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2013-08-01 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2013-07-31 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2013-07-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2013-06-12 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-12 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3300) |
2013-06-12 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2167. |
2013-06-12 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3299-3301) |
2013-06-12 | House | Mr. Hensarling moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Housing and community development
Housing finance and home ownership