US HB2166 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-9)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the President to create the Global Health Security Agenda Interagency Review Council to implement the Global Health Security Agenda, an initiative launched by nearly 30 nations to address global infectious disease threats. The council's responsibilities include (1) providing policy recommendations on agenda-related goals, objectives, and implementation; (2) helping federal agencies with implementation; and (3) reviewing the progress and challenges in achieving U.S. commitments, including assistance to help other countries meet agenda targets. The bill also directs the federal agencies involved with the agenda to prioritize its implementation and to take certain steps to achieve that goal. The President shall also appoint a U.S. Coordinator for Global Health Security to coordinate and report on the interagency process for responding to global health security emergencies.
Title
Global Health Security Act of 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4667-4668) |
2020-09-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2166. |
2020-09-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4667-4671) |
2020-09-22 | House | Mr. Castro (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-03-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Intelligence and Emerging Threats and Capabilities. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Intelligence (Permanent Select), for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3656 (Related) 2020-05-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB6395 (Related) 2021-01-02 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR1271 (Related) 2020-12-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Animal and plant health
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
World health
Animal and plant health
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Executive Office of the President
Foreign aid and international relief
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Health promotion and preventive care
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
World health