US HB2156 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-15)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the uses of the Abandoned Mine Reclamation Fund to provide support for economic revitalization, diversification, and development in economically distressed mining communities through the reclamation and restoration of land and water resources adversely affected by coal mining carried out before August 3, 1977. Specifically, it makes specified funds available to the Department of the Interior through FY2024 for distribution to states and Native American tribes for reclaiming and restoring abandoned mine lands and waters in such communities.
Title
RECLAIM Act of 2019 Revitalizing the Economy of Coal Communities by Leveraging Local Activities and Investing More Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 176. |
2019-10-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-223. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 26 - 10. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
SB4306 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB4306 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Coal
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Economic development
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian social and development programs
Land use and conservation
Mining
Pollution liability
Water quality
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Economic development
Environmental protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Indian social and development programs
Land use and conservation
Mining
Pollution liability
Water quality
Water use and supply