US HB2152 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-5)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-09-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eunice Kennedy Shriver Act - Reauthorizes the Special Olympics Sport and Empowerment Act of 2004 for FY2012-FY2016.Directs the Secretary of State to act through the Assistant Secretary of State for Educational and Cultural Affairs in awarding grants or entering agreements with Special Olympics for activities outside the United States. Includes community-based prevention among the activities for which the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) may award grants or enter into agreements with Special Olympics. Requires grant or agreement applications to include a description of specific measurable annual benchmarks, as well as long-term goals and objectives, to be achieved through specified activities, which must include: (1) activities to increase the full participation of people with intellectual disabilities in inclusive school and community activities with people without disabilities, (2) education programs that dispel negative stereotypes about people with intellectual disabilities, and (3) activities to increase the participation of people with intellectual disabilities in Special Olympics outside of the United States. Requires annual reports by Special Olympics to describe demographic data about Special Olympics participants.Authorizes the Secretary of Education to award grants or enter into contracts or cooperative agreements to promote the expansion of Best Buddies, including activities to increase the participation of people with intellectual disabilities in social relationships and other aspects of community life, including education and employment, within the United States. Directs the Secretary of Education to award competitive grants to institutions of higher education to establish Eunice Kennedy Shriver Institutes for Sport and Social Impact. Requires recipients to use grant funds to advance the quality of life and inclusion of people with intellectual disabilities through research and evaluation, technical assistance, training, data collection, evaluation, collaboration, and dissemination of evidence-based best practices.
Title
Eunice Kennedy Shriver Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2011-09-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education. |
2011-06-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Commerce, Manufacturing, and Trade. |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1086 (Same As) 2011-05-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Athletes
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Higher education
Olympic games
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Disability and paralysis
Education programs funding
Higher education
Olympic games
Social welfare
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2152/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2152/BILLS-112hr2152ih.pdf |