US HB2150 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Petroleum Reserve Alaska Access Act - (Sec. 2) Expresses the sense of Congress that: (1) the National Petroleum Reserve (NPR) in Alaska remains explicitly designated to provide oil and natural gas resources to the United States, and (2) it is national policy to actively advance oil and gas development within the NPR. (Sec. 3) Amends the Naval Petroleum Reserves Production Act of 1976 to require the mandatory program of competitive leasing of oil and gas in the NPR to include at least one lease sale annually in those areas of the NPR most likely to produce commercial quantities of oil and natural gas each year in the period 2011-2021. (Sec. 4) Directs the Secretary of the Interior to ensure permits, according to a specified timeline, for all surface development activities, including pipelines and roads construction to: (1) develop and bring into production any areas within the NPR that are subject to oil and gas leases; and (2) transport oil and gas from and through the NPR to existing transportation or processing infrastructure on the North Slope of Alaska. (Sec. 5) Instructs the Secretary to issue regulations establishing clear requirements to ensure that the Department of the Interior is supporting development of oil and gas leases in the NPR. (Sec. 6) Requires the Secretary to assess all technically recoverable fossil fuel resources within the NPR, including all conventional and unconventional oil and natural gas. Requires the resource assessment to be implemented by the U.S. Geological Survey, which is authorized to use resources and funds provided by the state of Alaska.
Title
National Petroleum Reserve Alaska Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Broun [R-GA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] |
Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN] | Rep. John Fleming [R-LA] | Rep. Bill Flores [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Jeffrey Landry [R-LA] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] |
Rep. David Rivera [R-FL] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 165. |
2011-10-14 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 112-249. |
2011-07-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 14. |
2011-07-13 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2011-07-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-06-16 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2011-06-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
HB4480 (Related) 2012-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska
Department of the Interior
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
Alaska
Department of the Interior
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways