US HB2142 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-112. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-5)
Status: Passed on January 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-10 - Became Public Law No: 115-112. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
INTERDICT Act International Narcotics Trafficking Emergency Response by Detecting Incoming Contraband with Technology Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) to: (1) increase the number of chemical screening devices available to CBP officers to interdict fentanyl, other synthetic opioids, and other narcotics and psychoactive substances that are illegally imported into the United States, including such substances imported through the mail or by an express consignment operator or carrier; and (2) dedicate the appropriate number of CBP personnel, including scientists, to interpret data collected by such devices during all operational hours. (Sec. 4) The bill authorizes appropriations to the CBP to ensure that the necessary screening and interdiction resources are available during all operational hours.
Title
INTERDICT Act International Narcotics Trafficking Emergency Response by Detecting Incoming Contraband with Technology Act
Sponsors
Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] |
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] |
Rep. Thomas MacArthur [R-NJ] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2017-10-24 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 574 (Y: 412 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-10 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-112. (TXT | PDF) |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2017-12-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2017-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8279) |
2017-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2017-10-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-10-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 412 - 3 (Roll no. 574). |
2017-10-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8096) |
2017-10-23 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-10-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2142. |
2017-10-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8057-8059; text: CR H8058) |
2017-10-23 | House | Mr. Fitzpatrick moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-21 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 227. |
2017-09-21 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 115-317. |
2017-09-07 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-09-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-07 | House | Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security Discharged. |
2017-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2017-05-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3011) |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB708 (Same As) 2017-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks: CR S1975-1977)
Subjects
Chemistry
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Customs enforcement
Department of Homeland Security
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Foreign trade and international finance
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management