US HB2127 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2907)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-27 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2907)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
National Paycheck Protection Act This bill amends the Labor-Management Reporting and Disclosure Act of 1959 to require the written consent of an employee, after a notice period of at least 35 days, before such employee's labor organization dues may be used for any purpose not directly related to the labor organization's collective bargaining or contract administration functions.
Title
National Paycheck Protection Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ted Budd [R-NC] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Louie Gohmert [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2907) |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2017-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2723 (Related) 2017-06-14 - Hearings Held by the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions Prior to Referral.
SB1774 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6544 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SB1774 (Related) 2017-09-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
HB6544 (Related) 2018-07-26 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2127/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2127/BILLS-115hr2127ih.pdf |