US HB2117 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 68-25)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FASTER Act of 2019 Food Allergy Safety, Treatment, Education, and Research Act of 2019 This bill directs the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention to expand data collection of information related to food allergies and specific allergens and revises the definition of major allergen to specifically include sesame. The Department of Health and Human Services may designate additional food ingredients as major allergens based on the prevalence and severity of allergic reactions through regulation. The Food and Drug Administration and the National Institutes of Health must report on specified information regarding food allergies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FASTER Act of 2019 Food Allergy Safety, Treatment, Education, and Research Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL]Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]
Rep. Jim Cooper [D-TN]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]
Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA]
Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. James Himes [D-CT]
Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Bryan Steil [R-WI]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Mike Gallagher [R-WI]Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]
Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Ben McAdams [D-UT]
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA]
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA]Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]
Rep. Dusty Johnson [R-SD]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI]Rep. Dan Meuser [R-PA]
Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH]Rep. Will Hurd [R-TX]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]
Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-04-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-08HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback