US HB2114 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Workforce Protections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ed Walker Memorial Act for Improvements to the Energy Employees Occupational Illness Compensation Program - Amends the Energy Employees Occupational Illness Compensation Program Act of 2000 to include certain former nuclear weapons program workers in the Special Exposure Cohort under the energy employees occupational illness compensation program. Directs the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) to: (1) issue regulations for designating additional classes of employees, including those employed during a period of residual contamination, as members of the Special Exposure Cohort; and (2) determine whether workers employed at the Bethlehem Steel site in Lackawanna, New York, meet the requirements of this Act for membership in the Special Exposure Cohort. Requires the Secretary to provide a report to Congress identifying facilities at which classes of employees were employed that meet the requirements for membership in the Special Exposure Cohort, as well as the number of classes and the number of employees in each class.
Title
Ed Walker Memorial Act for Improvements to the Energy Employees Occupational Illness Compensation Program
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Lee [R-NY] | Rep. Eric Massa [D-NY] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Workforce Protections. | |
2009-05-26 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law. | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to House Education and Labor | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2009-04-27 | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB916 (Same As) 2009-04-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Administrative remedies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Government liability
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Industrial facilities
Labor and employment
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Metals
New York State
Nuclear weapons
Public contracts and procurement
Radiobiology
Worker safety and health
Administrative remedies
Business records
Congressional oversight
Department of Energy
Department of Health and Human Services
Government liability
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Industrial facilities
Labor and employment
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Metals
New York State
Nuclear weapons
Public contracts and procurement
Radiobiology
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2114/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2114/BILLS-111hr2114ih.pdf |