US HB2103 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 102-11)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Pending: House Foreign Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
International Protecting Girls by Preventing Child Marriage Act of 2009 - Authorizes the President to provide assistance, including through multilateral, nongovernmental, and faith-based organizations, to prevent child marriage in developing countries and to promote the educational, health, economic, social, and legal empowerment of girls and women. Sets forth priority assistance criteria. Directs the President, through the Secretary of State, to establish a multi-year strategy to prevent child marriage in developing countries and to promote the empowerment of girls at risk of child marriage. Sets forth strategy elements. Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to require that Department of State country reports on human rights practices include a description of the status of child marriage for countries with specified rates of child marriage. Defines "child marriage" as the marriage of a girl or boy not yet the minimum age for marriage stipulated in law in the country in which the girl or boy is a resident.
Title
International Protecting Girls by Preventing Child Marriage Act of 2009
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-27 | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2410 (Related) 2009-06-22 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
HB2475 (Related) 2009-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB987 (Related) 2010-12-16 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 241 - 166 (Roll no. 645).
HB6521 (Related) 2010-12-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
HB2475 (Related) 2009-05-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SB987 (Related) 2010-12-16 - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Failed by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 241 - 166 (Roll no. 645).
HB6521 (Related) 2010-12-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
Marriage and family status
Women's health
Women's rights
World health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Elementary and secondary education
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
International affairs
Marriage and family status
Women's health
Women's rights
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2103/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr2103/BILLS-111hr2103ih.pdf |