US HB2098 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Homeland Security to establish a veterans visa program to permit veterans who have been removed from the United States to return as immigrants, and for other purposes.
Title
Veterans Visa and Protection Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1041 (Related) 2019-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Border security and unlawful immigration
Citizenship and naturalization
Government information and archives
Immigration status and procedures
Military personnel and dependents
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2098/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2098/BILLS-116hr2098ih.pdf |