US HB209 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1320)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Codifies certain provisions of an executive order requiring political appointees in the executive branch to sign an ethics pledge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Ethics in Government Act of 1978 to require political appointees to sign an ethics pledge, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-30HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H1320)
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Related) 2019-03-14 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 39.
HR172 (Similar To) 2019-03-06 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB1523 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HB1612 (Related) 2019-04-12 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
SB949 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback