US HB209 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-21)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-18 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Ensuring Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2015 This bill amends the Improving Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2009 to repeal the sunset of, and so extend indefinitely, the exclusion from resources under titles XVI (Supplemental Security Income) and XIX (Medicaid) of the Social Security Act, for eligibility purposes, of compensation in the amount of the first $2,000 per year received by individuals who participate in clinical trials for rare diseases or conditions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ensuring Access to Clinical Trials Act of 2015

Sponsors

Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]
Rep. Mark Amodei [R-NV]Rep. Tom Emmer [R-MN]Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO]Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Michael McCaul [R-TX]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX]
Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. John Fleming [R-LA]Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA]Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]
Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]
Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Lou Barletta [R-PA]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA]Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]
Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA]
Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA]Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS]
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-18HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2015-03-30HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2015-01-09HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2015-01-08HouseReferred to House Energy and Commerce
2015-01-08HouseReferred to House Ways and Means
2015-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2015-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB139 (Same As) 2015-10-07 - Became Public Law No: 114-63. (TXT | PDF)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback