US HB2086 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Coverage, No Penalty Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to exempt from the requirement to maintain minimum essential health coverage (commonly referred to as the individual mandate) individuals who reside in a rating area or county in which the Department of Health and Human Services certifies that no qualified health plans are offered through an exchange established under the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act.
Title
No Coverage, No Penalty Act
Sponsors
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] | Rep. Bob Goodlatte [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1933 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB2516 (Related) 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB761 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2100-2101)
HB2516 (Related) 2017-05-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB761 (Related) 2017-03-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2100-2101)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2086/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2086/BILLS-115hr2086ih.pdf |