US HB2079 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 112-109.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-15 - Became Public Law No: 112-109.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 10 Main Street in East Rockaway, New York, as the "John J. Cook Post Office."
Title
To designate the facility of the United States Postal Service located at 10 Main Street in East Rockaway, New York, as the "John J. Cook Post Office".
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY] | Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Ann Buerkle [R-NY] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] |
Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Nan Hayworth [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] |
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Hochul [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] |
Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] |
Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] | Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY] |
Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY] | Rep. Anthony Weiner [D-NY] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 418 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 418 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 418 N: 2 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-15 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 112-109. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2012-05-08 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2012-04-27 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2885) |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 373. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Lieberman without amendment. Without written report. |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2012-02-23 | Senate | Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs referred to Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security. |
2012-02-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2012-02-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2012-02-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 418 - 2 (Roll no. 52). (text: CR 02/14/2012 H705) |
2012-02-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H750) |
2012-02-14 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2012-02-14 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2079. |
2012-02-14 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H705-706) |
2012-02-14 | House | Mr. Kelly moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2011-11-03 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2011-11-03 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-11-03 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Discharged. |
2011-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy . |
2011-06-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. (text of measure as introduced: CR 11/14/2011 H7409) |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
New York State
Postal service
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
New York State
Postal service