US HB2061 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-198.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-198.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017 (Sec. 4) This bill provides for increased dissemination of news and information access to North Korea. The North Korean Human Rights Act of 2004 is amended to include news rebroadcasting in supported broadcasting to North Korea. (Sec. 5) The President may: (1) distribute or provide grants to distribute information receiving devices, electronically readable devices, and other informational sources into North Korea; and (2) provide grants to develop and distribute new products or methods to allow North Koreans easier access to outside information. The Broadcasting Board of Governors may broadcast American, Korean, Chinese, and other popular music, television, movies, and popular cultural references as part of its programming. The board shall broadcast to North Korea in the Korean language information on rights, laws, and freedoms afforded through the North Korean Constitution and through human rights treaties or other international agreements. The bill urges that information access efforts should include religious communities and be coordinated with the Office of International Religious Freedom. (Sec. 7) The President may provide grants for research on North Korea's denial of human rights. The bill extends through FY2022: (1) programs that promote human rights, democracy, the rule of law, and the development of a market economy in North Korea; (2) actions to promote freedom of information in North Korea; and (3) humanitarian assistance to North Koreans who are outside of North Korea without the permission of the government. The bill extends through 2022 annual reporting requirements regarding: (1) freedom of information, (2) North Korean human rights issues, (3) U.S. humanitarian assistance inside North Korea and to North Koreans outside of North Korea, and (4) the number of North Koreans seeking refugee status or political asylum in the United States.
Title
North Korean Human Rights Reauthorization Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] |
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Colleen Hanabusa [D-HI] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] |
Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL] | Rep. Daniel Donovan [R-NY] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 531 (Y: 415 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-198. |
2018-07-20 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H5787-5788) |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Ms. Ros-Lehtinen asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H5787-5788) |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.2240 Amendment SA 2240 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | S.Amdt.2240 Amendment SA 2240 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S2396) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S2396) |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2017-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 415 - 0 (Roll no. 531). (text: CR H7441-7442) |
2017-09-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7473-7474) |
2017-09-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2017-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2061. |
2017-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7441-7444) |
2017-09-25 | House | Mr. Royce (CA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1118 (Related) 2017-12-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 280.
Subjects
Asia
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Freedom of information
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Military personnel and dependents
North Korea
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Travel and tourism
China
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Department of State
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign aid and international relief
Freedom of information
Human rights
International affairs
International exchange and broadcasting
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Military personnel and dependents
North Korea
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
Rule of law and government transparency
South Korea
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Travel and tourism