US HB2056 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-13)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes service in the U.S. Cadet Nurse Corps during World War II as active military service. Individuals who served in the corps are eligible for specified honors and burial benefits but shall not be entitled by reason of such service to veterans' benefits generally.
Title
To recognize and honor the service of individuals who served in the United States Cadet Nurse Corps during World War II, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB997 (Related) 2019-04-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Health personnel
Military personnel and dependents
Nursing
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cemeteries and funerals
Conflicts and wars
Health personnel
Military personnel and dependents
Nursing
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2056/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2056/BILLS-116hr2056ih.pdf |