US HB205 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Protecting and Securing Florida's Coastline Act of 2019 This bill permanently extends the moratorium on oil and gas leasing, preleasing, and related activities in certain areas of the Gulf of Mexico.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting and Securing Florida's Coastline Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - House - On passage RC# 521 (Y: 248 N: 180 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - House - On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A003) as modified H.Amdt.616 RC# 520 (Y: 182 N: 251 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-12SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
2019-09-11HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-11HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 248 - 180 (Roll no. 521).
2019-09-11HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2019-09-11HouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 205.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.616 On agreeing to the Gosar amendment (A003) as modified Failed by recorded vote: 182 - 251 (Roll no. 520).
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Gosar amendment No. 3, as modified.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.616 Gosar amendment (A003) modified by unanimous consent. (text as modified: CR H7632)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.616 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Gosar. (consideration: CR H7632-7633; text: CR H7632)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.615 On agreeing to the Barragan amendment (A002) Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Barragan amendment No. 2.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.615 Amendment (A002) offered by Ms. Barragan. (consideration: CR H7631-7632; text: CR H7631)
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.614 On agreeing to the Crist amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
2019-09-11HouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 548, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Crist amendment No. 1.
2019-09-11HouseH.Amdt.614 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Crist. (consideration: CR H7630-7631; text: CR H7630)
2019-09-11HouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 205.
2019-09-11HouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Al Lawson, Jr. to act as Chairman of the Committee.
2019-09-11HouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 548 and Rule XVIII.
2019-09-11HouseProviding for consideration of H.R. 205, H.R. 1146, and H.R. 1941.
2019-09-11HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 548. (consideration: CR H7622-7634; text: CR H7630)
2019-09-09HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 548 Reported to House. Providing for consideration of H.R. 205, H.R. 1146, and H.R. 1941.
2019-07-16HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 116.
2019-07-16HouseReported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-156.
2019-06-19HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 12.
2019-06-19HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-19HouseSubcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged.
2019-04-02HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
2019-01-03HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR548 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback