US HB2044 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assists the building sector in adopting smart building technology that increases energy efficiency. Smart buildings are buildings with energy systems that (1) are flexible and automated; (2) have extensive operational monitoring and communication connectivity, allowing remote monitoring and analysis of building functions; (3) take a systems-based approach in integrating the overall building operations for control of energy generation, consumption, and storage; (4) communicate with utilities and other third-party commercial entities, if appropriate; (5) protect the health and safety of occupants and workers; and (6) are cybersecure. Specifically, the bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a Federal Smart Building Program. Under the program, DOE must implement smart building technology in certain federal buildings and demonstrate the costs and benefits of smart buildings. DOE may expand awards made under the Federal Energy Management Program and the Better Building Challenge to recognize specific federal agency achievements in accelerating the adoption of smart building technologies. In addition, DOE must conduct (1) a survey of privately owned smart buildings throughout the United States and evaluate their costs and benefits, and (2) research and development on barriers to the integration of advanced building technologies. As part of the Better Building Challenge, DOE must demonstrate policies and approaches that accelerate the transition to smart buildings.
Title
Smart Building Acceleration Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2019-05-16 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2741 (Related) 2019-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
SB2335 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272.
SB2335 (Related) 2019-10-24 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 272.
Subjects
Building construction
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Worker safety and health
Computer security and identity theft
Congressional oversight
Energy
Energy efficiency and conservation
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government studies and investigations
Internet and video services
Public contracts and procurement
Public utilities and utility rates
Research and development
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2044/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2044/BILLS-116hr2044ih.pdf |