US HB2038 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the conveyance of certain Coast Guard property in Tok, Alaska, and for other purposes. This bill authorizes the Coast Guard (CG) to convey 3.25 acres of CG real property (including all improvements located on the property) in Tok, Alaska, upon payment to the United States of the fair market value of the property. The Tanana Chief's Conference shall have the right of first refusal to purchase the property. The property must be sold at fair market value. The United States shall deposit the proceeds in the CG Housing Fund.
Title
To authorize the conveyance of certain Coast Guard property in Tok, Alaska, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2015-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1987 (Related) 2015-05-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1611 (Related) 2015-11-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
SB1611 (Related) 2015-11-30 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 302.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2038/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2038/BILLS-114hr2038ih.pdf |