US HB2024 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish the Southern Maryland National Heritage Area, and for other purposes.
Title
Southern Maryland National Heritage Area Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steny Hoyer [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-07-19 | House | Pursuant to section 9 of H. Res. 1232, and the motion offered by Ms. DeLauro, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 1286, as amended; H.R. 2024, as amended; H.R. 3222, as amended; H.R. 6337, as amended; and H.R. 7002, as amended. (consideration: CR H6859-6865; text: CR H6861-6862) |
2022-07-19 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 1232, proceedings on H.R. 2024 are considered vacated. |
2022-07-18 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-07-18 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2024. |
2022-07-18 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6690-6691; text: CR H6690-6691) |
2022-07-18 | House | Mr. Huffman moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-07-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 316. |
2022-07-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-409. |
2021-10-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-06-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Same As) 2021-10-06 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
HR1232 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1232 (Related) 2022-07-19 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.