US HB2019 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 144-9)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 113-94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 144-9)
Status: Passed on April 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Became Public Law No: 113-94.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gabriella Miller Kids First Research Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to terminate the entitlement of any major or minor political party to a payment from the Presidential Election Campaign Fund for a presidential nominating convention. Transfers amounts in each account maintained for such purpose for the national committee of a party to a 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund, making them available only for allocation to national research institutes and national centers through the Common Fund for making grants for pediatric research under this Act. Amends the Public Health Service Act to require the Director of the National Institutes of Health (NIH), through the Division of Program Coordination, Planning, and Strategic Initiatives, to allocate funds appropriated under this Act to the national research institutes and national centers for making grants for pediatric research representing important areas of emerging scientific opportunities, rising public health challenges, or knowledge gaps that deserve special emphasis and would benefit from conducting or supporting additional research that involves collaboration between two or more national research institutes or national centers, or would otherwise benefit from strategic coordination and planning. Authorizes $12.6 million out of the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund for each of FY2014-FY2023 for pediatric research through the Common Fund. Requires such funds to supplement, not supplant, funds otherwise allocated by NIH for pediatric research. Prohibits the use of such amounts for any purpose other than allocating funds for making grants for pediatric research described in this Act.
Title
Gabriella Miller Kids First Research Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-11 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 295 N: 103 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-94. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1492) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 289. |
2013-12-20 | Senate | Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2013-12-11 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2013-12-11 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 103 (Roll no. 632). (text: CR H7653-7654) |
2013-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House resumed debate on H.R. 2019. |
2013-12-11 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2019. |
2013-12-11 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7653-7666) |
2013-12-11 | House | Mr. Upton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2013-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-05-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on House Administration, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1724 (Related) 2013-06-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Subjects
Child health
Department of Health and Human Services
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Department of Health and Human Services
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Executive agency funding and structure
Government trust funds
Health
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
National Institutes of Health (NIH)
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers