US HB2016 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Disaster Recovery Reform Act of 2018 to develop a study regarding streamlining and consolidating information collection and preliminary damage assessments, and for other purposes.
Title
Federal Disaster Assistance Coordination Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2021-06-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-06-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2769) |
2021-06-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2016. |
2021-06-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2769-2771) |
2021-06-15 | House | Ms. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-28 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 29. |
2021-05-28 | House | Reported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-46. |
2021-03-24 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-24 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |