US HB2009 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act (Sec. 3) This bill declares that 39.65 acres of land are to be held in trust by the United States for the benefit of the Pascua Yaqui Tribe of Arizona, effective the day after the Tuscon Unified School District No. 1 relinquishes its interest in the land. (Sec. 4) The United States must convey to the school district 13.24 acres of federal land in exchange for payment of the fair market value of the land and the cost of conveyance. The school district may acquire the federal reversionary interest in 27.5 acres of district land by paying the appraised value, plus the costs of appraisal and conveyance, to the Department of the Interior. (Sec. 5) Gaming is prohibited on the land taken into trust pursuant to this bill. (Sec. 6) There are no federal reserved water rights for the land taken into trust. The tribe retains state water rights for this land. Water rights for this land may not be forfeited or abandoned.
Title
Pascua Yaqui Tribe Land Conveyance Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Trent Franks [R-AZ] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] |
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ] | Rep. Matt Salmon [R-AZ] | Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-22 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held. |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2016-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-06-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3489) |
2016-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2009. |
2016-06-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3489-3490) |
2016-06-07 | House | Mr. Hardy moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2016-05-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 425. |
2016-05-10 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-550. |
2016-03-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-03-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2016-03-15 | House | Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs Discharged. |
2016-03-15 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-11-04 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2015-05-11 | House | Re-referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-05-11 | House | Re-referred to the Subcommittee on Indian, Insular and Alaska Native Affairs. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Arizona
Elementary and secondary education
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans
Elementary and secondary education
Federal-Indian relations
Gambling
Indian lands and resources rights
Land transfers
Native Americans