US HB2008 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-15 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keeping Politics Out of Federal Contracting Act of 2011 - Prohibits the head of an executive agency from: (1) requiring a contractor to submit political information as part of a soliticitation, request for bid, request for proposal, or any other communiction in connection with the award of a contract for procurement of property or services or during the course of the contract performance until the completion of a contract; (2) using such political information as a factor or consideration in the source selection process used to award a competitive or non-competitive contract; or (3) including such political information in a contracting past performance database. Defines "political information" as information relating to political spending, including any payment for an electioneering communication, by a contractor or persons related to such contractor to a candidate for federal office, a political commitee, a political party, or to a third party entity for political purposes.
Title
Keeping Politics Out of Federal Contracting Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] |
Rep. Raul Labrador [R-ID] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Rep. Patrick McHenry [R-NC] | Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN] |
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-15 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 384. |
2012-06-15 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 112-536. |
2012-04-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2012-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform . |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1100 (Same As) 2012-12-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 570.
Subjects
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Political advertising
Political parties and affiliation
Public contracts and procurement
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Political advertising
Political parties and affiliation
Public contracts and procurement