US HB2006 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 25 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-25 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
VA Procurement Efficiency and Transparency Act (Sec. 2) This bill requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA), with respect to any VA contract that is reported in the Federal Procurement Data System, to record the amount of any cost or price savings realized by using competitive procedures in awarding such contract. (Sec. 3) The VA shall make available and use on a VA-wide basis the standardized procurement templates used by the Central Office of the VA, the Veterans Health Administration, the Veterans Benefits Administration, and the National Cemetery Administration. Such templates may be customized to address particular procurement situations.
Title
VA Procurement Efficiency and Transparency Act
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-07-24 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-07-24 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6174-6175) |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H6199) |
2017-07-24 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Walz objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was considered as withdrawn. |
2017-07-24 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2006. |
2017-07-24 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6174-6175) |
2017-07-24 | House | Mr. Roe (TN) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-07-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178. |
2017-07-24 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-246. |
2017-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-12 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . |
2017-07-12 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Public contracts and procurement
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government information and archives
Public contracts and procurement