US HB2004 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-12 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits the termination of federal-employee dental, vision, and long-term-care insurance coverage as a result of unpaid premiums or other periodic charges in the event of a lapse in appropriations that results in an employee being furloughed or an excepted employee working without pay. This includes supplemental dental, vision, and long-term-care insurance policies.
Title
Ensuring FEDVIP and FLTCIP Coverage During Shutdowns Act
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] |
Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB973 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Appropriations
Dental care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care coverage and access
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
Dental care
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Health
Health care coverage and access
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Long-term, rehabilitative, and terminal care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2004/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2004/BILLS-116hr2004ih.pdf |