US HB2004 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
Pending: House Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform .
Pending: House Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Technology Security and Antiboycott Act - Technology Security Act - Directs the President to control the transfer of items (any goods, technology, software, and services) by U.S. persons and by foreign persons subject to U.S. jurisdiction in order to: (1) prevent the transfer of items that would pose a risk to U.S. national security or foreign policy; (2) secure the cooperation of other governments and multilateral organizations to impose similar controls; (3) maintain U.S. leadership in science, engineering, technology, and manufacturing; (4) sustain the viability of commercial firms, academic institutions, and research establishments; (5) sustain the domestic defense industrial base; and (6) enforce the controls through regulations, compliance requirements, controlled item lists, and lists of foreign persons who threaten U.S. national security or foreign policy. Requires a license for the transfer of items to a country if: (1) such country has repeatedly provided support for acts of international terrorism; and (2) such items could make a significant contribution to such country's military potential, or could enhance its ability to support acts of international terrorism. Requires congressional notification before any license may be issued. Authorizes the President to establish a Transfer Policy Committee. Sets forth criminal and civil penalties for violations of such control and license provisions. Repeals the Export Administration Act of 1979. Antiboycott Act - Directs the President to issue regulations prohibiting, with specified exceptions, any U.S. person from taking specified actions to support (or actions to evade such regulations) any foreign-imposed or -fostered boycott against a country that is friendly to the United States and is not itself the object of any form of U.S. boycott. Sets forth civil penalties for violations of such regulations. Directs the President to impose specified sanctions against a U.S. person that knowingly: (1) exports, transfers, or otherwise engages in the trade of controlled defense items or missiles or related technology; or (2) conspires to, or facilitates, such export, transfer, or trade. Directs the President to impose procurement sanctions against a foreign person that knowingly and materially contributed to the efforts of a foreign country, project, or entity to use, develop, produce, or stockpile chemical or biological weapons through the export from: (1) the United States of any item that is subject to U.S. jurisdiction under this Act; or (2) any other country of any item that would be, if they were U.S. goods or technology, subject to such U.S. jurisdiction. Applies such sanctions to: (1) a foreign country, project, or entity that after January 1, 1980 has used or made preparations to use, chemical or biological weapons in violation of international law or against its own nationals; or (2) a foreign country whose government has repeatedly provided support for acts of international terrorism. Sets forth provisions regarding: (1) waiver or termination of sanctions, and (2) congressional notification.
Title
Technology Security and Antiboycott Act
Sponsors
Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform . |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2589 (Related) 2011-10-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Middle East and South Asia .
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Advisory bodies
Arms control and nonproliferation
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Homeland security
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Presidents and presidential powers
Public contracts and procurement
Research and development
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
Advisory bodies
Arms control and nonproliferation
Competitiveness, trade promotion, trade deficits
Computers and information technology
Congressional oversight
Executive agency funding and structure
Foreign and international corporations
Government information and archives
Homeland security
International affairs
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Licensing and registrations
Manufacturing
Military procurement, research, weapons development
Military readiness
Presidents and presidential powers
Public contracts and procurement
Research and development
Sanctions
Technology transfer and commercialization
Terrorism
Trade agreements and negotiations
Trade restrictions
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2004/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2004/BILLS-112hr2004ih.pdf |