US HB1992 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-29 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
American Soda Ash Competitiveness Act (Sec. 2) Sets at 2%, for a five-year period, the royalty rate on the quantity or gross value of the output of sodium compounds and related products at the point of shipment to market from federal land.
Title
American Soda Ash Competitiveness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Mo Brooks [R-AL] |
Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Mimi Walters [R-CA] |
Rep. Kevin Yoder [R-KS] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 178. |
2015-07-29 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-236. |
2015-06-11 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 12. |
2015-06-11 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-11 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2015-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-05-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-04-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2031 (Same As) 2015-10-01 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on Public Lands, Forests, and Mining. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-368.