US HB1990 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Keep the IRS Off Your Health Care Act of 2013 - Prohibits the Secretary of the Treasury, or any delegate of the Secretary, from implementing or enforcing any provisions of or amendments made by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act or the Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010.
Title
Keep the IRS Off Your Health Care Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Price [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2009 (Same As) 2013-09-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 192.
SB983 (Same As) 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3580)
HB2125 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1315 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
SB983 (Same As) 2013-05-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3580)
HB2125 (Related) 2013-07-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health, Employment, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1315 (Related) 2013-07-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 137.
Subjects
Department of the Treasury
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Internal Revenue Service (IRS)
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1990/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1990/BILLS-113hr1990ih.pdf |