US HB1982 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2017 This bill authorizes FY2018 appropriations for the Department of Justice, the Department of Health and Human Services, and the Social Security Administration to: (1) increase access to mental health care treatment and services, and (2) promote reporting of mental health information to the National Instant Criminal Background Check System.
Title
Mental Health Access and Gun Violence Prevention Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE] | Rep. Al Green [D-TX] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mental health
Social Security Administration
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Health and Human Services
Department of Justice
Executive agency funding and structure
Firearms and explosives
Health care coverage and access
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mental health
Social Security Administration
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1982/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1982/BILLS-115hr1982ih.pdf |