US HB1978 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-08-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veterans Conservation Corps Act of 2015 Directs the Secretary of Veterans Affairs (VA) to establish a veterans conservation corps to assist unemployed veterans in the transition from service in the Armed Forces to civilian life and to employ such veterans: (1) in conservation, resource management, firefighting, law enforcement, and historic preservation projects on public lands; (2) in maintenance and improvement projects for cemeteries under the jurisdiction of the National Cemetery Administration; and (3) as firefighters, law enforcement officers, and disaster relief personnel. Requires priority to be given to the employment of veterans who served on active duty on or after September 11, 2001. Requires, as part of the veterans conservation corps: (1) the Secretary of Homeland Security (DHS) to award grants under the Federal Fire Prevention and Control Act of 1974 to hire veterans as firefighters, (2) the Attorney General to award grants under the public safety and community policing grant program (COPS ON THE BEAT grant program) under the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 to hire veterans as law enforcement officers, and (3) the DHS Secretary to provide funds to increase participation by veterans in the Federal Emergency Management Agency Corps program. Authorizes the VA Secretary to transfer amounts to carry out the corps to the Attorney General, the Chief of Engineers, the Corporation for National and Community Service, and the Secretaries of Agriculture, Commerce, DHS, and Interior. Directs the VA Secretary to establish a steering committee to establish selection criteria for, and provide advice to the VA Secretary on, the awarding of assistance under this Act.
Title
Veterans Conservation Corps Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX] |
Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] |
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Patrick Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. John Conyers [D-MI] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings and Emergency Management. |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to House Science, Space, and Technology |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, the Judiciary, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Army Corps of Engineers
Cemeteries and funerals
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Law enforcement officers
National and community service
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Army Corps of Engineers
Cemeteries and funerals
Corporation for National and Community Service
Department of Agriculture
Department of the Interior
Disaster relief and insurance
Fires
First responders and emergency personnel
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land use and conservation
Law enforcement officers
National and community service
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1978/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1978/BILLS-114hr1978ih.pdf |