US HB1968 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-7)
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Cold War Service Medal Act of 2011 - Authorizes the Secretary of the military department concerned to issue the Cold War Service Medal to members of the Armed Forces who were discharged or released under honorable conditions after having: (1) served on active duty for at least 24 consecutive months during the Cold War (September 2, 1945, through December 26, 1991), (2) deployed outside the continental United States for at least 30 days during such period, or (3) performed other Cold War service as the Secretary of Defense (DOD) may prescribe. Expresses the sense of Congress that the Secretary should expedite the design of the Medal as well its issuance to eligible members.
Title
Cold War Service Medal Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY] | Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA] | Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA] |
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY] | Rep. Nan Hayworth [R-NY] | Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Todd Platts [R-PA] | Rep. Nick Rahall [D-WV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-05-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
SB402 (Same As) 2011-02-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1968/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1968/BILLS-112hr1968ih.pdf |