US HB1967 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-22 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Bureau of Reclamation Pumped Storage Hydropower Development Act (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Reclamation Project Act of 1939 to provide that provisions respecting the sales of electric power and leases of power privileges in connection with the operation of any municipal water supply project shall be an authorization in addition to and alternative to any authority in existing laws related to pumped storage hydropower development exclusively utilizing Bureau of Reclamation reservoirs.
Title
Bureau of Reclamation Pumped Storage Hydropower Development Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-22 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-22 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S8034-8035; text: CR S8034-8035) |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 663. |
2018-11-26 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 115-377. |
2018-10-02 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-06-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-06-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5210) |
2017-06-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1967. |
2017-06-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5210-5211) |
2017-06-27 | House | Mr. Cook moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-06-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 105. |
2017-06-02 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-158. |
2017-04-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-04-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB5895 (Related) 2018-09-21 - Became Public Law No: 115-244.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Electric power generation and transmission
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply
Electric power generation and transmission
Water resources development
Water storage
Water use and supply