US HB1954 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Servicemembers and Veterans Empowerment and Support Act of 2017 This bill expands Department of Defense (DOD) sexual trauma counseling and treatment to include: (1) cyber harassment of a sexual nature, and (2) members of the Armed Forces on active duty for training or inactive duty training. The bill sets forth the standard of proof, which may be rebutted, in the case of a veteran who claims that a covered mental health condition was incurred in or aggravated by military sexual trauma during active service. The reasons for granting or denying service-connection in each case shall be recorded in full. DOD shall ensure that: (1) in a compensation claim for post-traumatic stress disorder based on sexual assault, battery, cyber harassment, or harassment experienced during active military service, non-DOD evidence may corroborate the veteran's account of such assault, battery, or harassment; and (2) behavior changes may be considered as corroborating evidence. DOD shall: (1) report annually through 2027 on submitted claims to identify and track the consistency of decisions across regional offices, (2) inform members of the Armed Forces of their eligibility for services at Vet Centers, and (3) ensure that Sexual Assault Response Coordinators advise members of the Armed Forces who report instances of military sexual trauma about their eligibility for Vet Center services.
Title
Servicemembers and Veterans Empowerment and Support Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB833 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 115-320.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crimes against women
Criminal justice information and records
Disability assistance
Evidence and witnesses
Health information and medical records
Internet and video services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Sex offenses
Sexually transmitted diseases
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Women's health
Assault and harassment offenses
Congressional oversight
Crimes against women
Criminal justice information and records
Disability assistance
Evidence and witnesses
Health information and medical records
Internet and video services
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Mental health
Military education and training
Military personnel and dependents
Sex offenses
Sexually transmitted diseases
Veterans' medical care
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Women's health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1954/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1954/BILLS-115hr1954ih.pdf |