US HB1948 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 217-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-15 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to modify authorities relating to the collective bargaining of employees in the Veterans Health Administration.
Title
VA Employee Fairness Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-12-15 - House - Passage of a Measure (Y: 219 N: 201 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2022-12-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-12-15 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 219 - 201 (Roll no. 530). (text: CR H9863) |
2022-12-15 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9882-9883) |
2022-12-15 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 1948, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote, announced that the ayes had prevailed. Mr. Bost demanded the yeas and nays and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced. |
2022-12-15 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2022-12-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 1948. |
2022-12-15 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1948, S. 3905 and S. 4003. Rule provides for one hour of general debate each for H.R. 1948, S. 3905, S. 4003. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1437. Rule provides that H. Res. 1516 and H. Con. Res. 124 are adopted. Rule provides that the House shall be considered to have taken from the Speaker's table H.R. 2617, with the Senate amendments thereto, to have concurred in the Senate amendments numbered 1, 2, 3, and 5, and to have concurred in the Senate amendment numbered 4 with an amendment consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 117-73. |
2022-12-15 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 1518. (consideration: CR H9863-9866) |
2022-12-14 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 1518 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 1948, S. 3905 and S. 4003. Rule provides for one hour of general debate each for H.R. 1948, S. 3905, S. 4003. Rule provides for one hour of general debate on the Senate amendment to H.R. 1437. Rule provides that H. Res. 1516 and H. Con. Res. 124 are adopted. Rule provides that the House shall be considered to have taken from the Speaker's table H.R. 2617, with the Senate amendments thereto, to have concurred in the Senate amendments numbered 1, 2, 3, and 5, and to have concurred in the Senate amendment numbered 4 with an amendment consisting of the text of Rules Committee Print 117-73. (consideration: CR H9745-9751) |
2022-12-12 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 446. |
2022-12-12 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 117-618. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 17 - 11. |
2021-04-21 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-03-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-03-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB771 (Related) 2021-03-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
HR1518 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1518 (Related) 2022-12-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.