US HB1945 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Wildlife and Hunting Heritage Conservation Council Advisory Committee Act This bill amends the Fish and Wildlife Coordination Act to establish the Wildlife and Hunting Heritage Conservation Council Advisory Committee to advise the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture on wildlife and habitat conservation, hunting, and recreational shooting. The advisory committee must advise the departments on policies or programs related to: implementing Executive Order No. 13443: Facilitation of Hunting Heritage and Wildlife Conservation; conserving and restoring wetlands, agricultural lands, grasslands, forest, and rangeland habitats; promoting opportunities for and access to hunting and shooting sports on federal lands; recruiting and retaining new hunters and shooters; increasing public awareness of the importance of wildlife conservation and the benefits of recreational hunting and shooting; and encouraging coordination among the public, the hunting and shooting sports community, wildlife conservation groups, states, tribes, and the federal government. The bill also specifies requirements for membership, meetings, pay and expenses, administrative support, and annual reports to Congress. The advisory committee is exempt from the Federal Advisory Committee Act. The bill abolishes the existing Wildlife and Hunting Heritage Conservation Council, effective on the date of the first meeting of the advisory committee established by this bill.
Title
Wildlife and Hunting Heritage Conservation Council Advisory Committee Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] |
Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Bishop [R-MI] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] |
Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Animals
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Hunting and fishing
Outdoor recreation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1945/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1945/BILLS-115hr1945ih.pdf |