US HB1944 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend section 100905 of title 54, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to require annual permits and assess annual fees for commercial filming activities on Federal land for film crews of 5 persons or fewer, and for other purposes. This bill directs the Departments of the Interior and Agriculture to assess an annual fee of $200 for any film crew of five persons or fewer to conduct commercial filming activities or similar projects on federal land administered by such departments and to require a one-year permit for such activities or projects that occur in areas designated for public use during public hours on federal land and waterways administered by such departments.
Title
To amend section 100905 of title 54, United States Code, to direct the Secretary of the Interior and the Secretary of Agriculture to require annual permits and assess annual fees for commercial filming activities on Federal land for film crews of 5 persons or fewer, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS] | Rep. Ted Yoho [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4489 (Related) 2018-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment.
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
HB3668 (Related) 2017-09-18 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 224.
Subjects
Forests, forestry, trees
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Television and film
User charges and fees
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Television and film
User charges and fees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1944/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1944/BILLS-115hr1944ih.pdf |