US HB1933 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Immigration and Nationality Act with respect to the admission of nonimmigrant nurses (H-1C visa) in health professional shortage areas to: (1) permit a one-time three-year extension of admission, and (2) reduce the maximum number of such visas per fiscal year to 300. Authorizes such nonimmigrant alien to accept new employment as a registered nurse at any facility which qualifies for the H-1C program upon a prospective employer's filing of a new petition. Continues employment authorization until adjudication of a new petition. Terminates such authorization if a petition is denied. Requires such nonimmigrant alien: (1) to have been lawfully admitted to the United States; (2) to have not been employed without authorization since admission; and (3) to have had a prospective employer file a petition for new employment before the date of expiration of the authorized period of stay, except that if the alien is terminated or laid off by his or her employer such new employment petition shall be filed during the ensuing 45-day period.
Title
To amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to modify the requirements for admission of nonimmigrant nurses in health professional shortage areas.
Sponsors
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX] | Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2011-08-01 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 407 N: 17 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2011-08-01 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2011-08-01 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 17 (Roll no. 685). (text: CR H5821) |
2011-08-01 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5830-5831) |
2011-08-01 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2011-08-01 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1933. |
2011-08-01 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5821-5822) |
2011-08-01 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2011-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 99. |
2011-07-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 112-153. |
2011-06-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2011-06-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
Subjects
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Nursing
Visas and passports
Health personnel
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Nursing
Visas and passports