US HB1921 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorizes through FY2026 and revises the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program. Under the existing program, the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) must develop and fund projects to restore the ecological health of the basin, which is located in Louisiana and Mississippi. The bill requires the EPA to review and revise the basin's comprehensive conservation and management plan at least once every five years. In addition, the bill eliminates a statement of the basin's size.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Federal Water Pollution Control Act to reauthorize the Lake Pontchartrain Basin Restoration Program, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-16SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
2021-06-15HousePursuant to section 8 of H. Res. 473, and the motion offered by Mr. McGovern, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 293; H.R. 587; H.R. 610, as amended; H.R. 1144, as amended; H.R. 1703, as amended; H.R. 1921; H.R. 2008; H.R. 2332, as amended; H.R. 2545; and H.R. 3642, as amended. (consideration: CR H2792-2799; text: CR H2797)
2021-06-15HousePursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 473, proceedings on H.R. 1921 are considered vacated.
2021-06-15HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-06-15HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1921.
2021-06-15HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2766-2767; text: CR H2766)
2021-06-15HouseMs. Norton moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2021-05-28HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 30.
2021-05-28HouseReported by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 117-47.
2021-03-24HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 54 - 3.
2021-03-24HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-03-24HouseSubcommittee on Water Resources and Environment Discharged.
2021-03-17HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2021-03-16HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2021-03-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HR473 (Related) 2021-06-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. (text: CR H2716)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback