US HB1901 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2671)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-30 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2671)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PTC Elimination Act This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to phase out and eventually eliminate the tax credit for production of electricity from renewable resources. The bill repeals the inflation adjustment for current recipients of the tax credit and modifies the "beginning of construction" requirement to require that construction of an eligible project is continuous and makes significant progress. The credit is repealed in its entirety after December 31, 2025. The bill expresses the sense of Congress that the credit should be allowed to expire and should not be extended beyond its expiration date. The bill also reduces the corporate income tax by an applicable percentage based on increases in revenues resulting from this bill.
Title
PTC Elimination Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-30 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2671) |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-04-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2158 (Related) 2015-10-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Income tax credits
Income tax rates
Taxation
Corporate finance and management
Electric power generation and transmission
Income tax credits
Income tax rates
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1901/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1901/BILLS-114hr1901ih.pdf |