US HB1900 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on June 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-17 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-304.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act (Sec. 2) This bill designates the veterans memorial and museum currently being constructed in Columbus, Ohio, as the "National Veterans Memorial and Museum." Such designation may be withdrawn if Congress finds the museum's progress and operation to be unsatisfactory, but no earlier than five years after the museum opens to the public. As a condition of designation, the director of the museum shall report to Congress regarding: (1) a projected five-year budget, (2) outreach to veterans about the design and contents of the museum, (3) the exhibit decision-making process, (4) organizational structure, (5) bylaws and rules, and (6) organizations that have accredited the museum.
Title
National Veterans Memorial and Museum Act
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH] |
Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] | Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Marcia Fudge [D-OH] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. James Renacci [R-OH] | Rep. Jim Jordan [R-OH] |
Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-304. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-186. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3264) |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 432. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2017-11-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2017-11-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2017-11-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8554) |
2017-11-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1900. |
2017-11-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8554-8556) |
2017-11-07 | House | Mr. Bilirakis moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-11-07 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 99. |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee on Natural Resources discharged. |
2017-11-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 115-399, Part I. |
2017-11-02 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-11-02 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-09-13 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB841 (Related) 2017-07-19 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Ohio
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Monuments and memorials
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Ohio
Veterans' organizations and recognition