US HB1884 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 101-1-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 19.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Repeals the requirement for the Department of Agriculture to convey the 2,422 acres of Forest System land located in Tonto National Forest in Pinal County, Arizona, known as Oak Flat, to Resolution Copper Mining, LLC, in exchange for various parcels of land owned by Resolution Copper. Oak Flat is withdrawn from (1) entry, appropriation, or disposal under the public land laws; (2) location, entry, and patent under the mining laws; and (3) disposition under all laws pertaining to mineral and geothermal leasing or mineral materials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Save Oak Flat Act

Sponsors

Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]
Rep. Marie Newman [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA]Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]
Rep. Mondaire Jones [D-NY]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]
Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Cindy Axne [D-IA]Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA]
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]
Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Melanie Stansbury [D-NM]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Jamaal Bowman [D-NY]Rep. Sara Jacobs [D-CA]
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]Rep. Kathy Manning [D-NC]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC]
Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO]
Rep. Carolyn Bourdeaux [D-GA]Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]
Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Nikema Williams [D-GA]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Sheila Cherfilus-McCormick [D-FL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseOrdered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 19.
2021-04-28HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2021-04-28HouseSubcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States Discharged.
2021-04-28HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged.
2021-04-13HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2021-04-12HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2021-03-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2021-03-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB915 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback