US HB187 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-08 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
For the relief of Victoria Galindo Lopez.
Title
For the relief of Victoria Galindo Lopez.
Sponsors
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
2022-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-06-07 | House | On passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5237-5238) |
2022-06-07 | House | Considered from the Private Calendar. (consideration: CR H5237-5238) |
2022-06-07 | House | Called up from the Private Calendar for consideration. |
2022-02-01 | House | Placed on the Private Calendar, Calendar No. 1. |
2022-02-01 | House | Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 117-236. |
2021-09-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-09-29 | House | Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship Discharged. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Citizenship. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |