US HB1863 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Secretary of State to report annually to Congress regarding: (1) efforts by Mexico to meet its deliveries of water to the Rio Grande in accordance with the Treaty between the United States and Mexico Respecting Utilization of Waters of the Colorado and Tijuana Rivers and of the Rio Grande; and (2) benefits to the United States of the Interim International Cooperative Measures in the Colorado River Basin through 2017 and Extension of Minute 318 Cooperative Measures to Address the Continued Effects of the April 2010 Earthquake in the Mexicali Valley, Baja, California.
Title
To require the Secretary of State to submit a report on water sharing with Mexico.
Sponsors
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Michael Conaway [R-TX] | Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Pete Gallego [D-TX] |
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere. |
2013-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2307 (Related) 2013-07-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Western Hemisphere.
SB1125 (Related) 2013-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4060)
SB1125 (Related) 2013-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4060)
Subjects
Congressional oversight
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
Natural disasters
Water use and supply
International law and treaties
International organizations and cooperation
Lakes and rivers
Latin America
Mexico
Natural disasters
Water use and supply
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/1863/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr1863/BILLS-113hr1863ih.pdf |