US HB1836 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Monuments Protection Act Directs the Departments of the Interior and Agriculture to enter into an agreement with a state, the District of Columbia, a federally recognized Indian tribe, a U.S. territory or possession, or a political subdivision of such an entity that offers to assume activities to resume or continue operations and public access to any covered unit during any period when those activities would not otherwise be carried out because: (1) there is a lapse in available federal funds as a result of a failure to enact a regular appropriations bill or continuing resolution, or (2) there are insufficient federal funds to operate such unit as a result of a failure of the federal government to make sufficient funds available. Defines a "covered unit" to mean: public lands, units of the National Park System, units of the National Wildlife Refuge System, federally owned open air monuments and memorials, units of the National Forest System, and federally owned roads and off ramps on all such lands. Requires Interior and USDA to reimburse such an entity once funds are made available for activities carried out by such entity.
Title
Monuments Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Darrell Issa [R-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Mark Sanford [R-SC] |
Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] | Rep. Mick Mulvaney [R-SC] | Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC] | Rep. Trey Gowdy [R-SC] |
Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Robert Pittenger [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to House Natural Resources |
2015-04-16 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-04-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB146 (Related) 2015-06-10 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Senate Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. With printed Hearing: S.Hrg. 114-338.
Subjects
Appropriations
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Intergovernmental relations
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal-Indian relations
Forests, forestry, trees
Intergovernmental relations
Monuments and memorials
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Roads and highways
State and local government operations
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1836/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1836/BILLS-114hr1836ih.pdf |